This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 07:52:26 (UTC).

1 World Online, Inc., a Calif VS Intellectsoft LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 1 World Online, Inc , a Calif filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Intellectsoft LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is C. DON CLAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2846

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

C. DON CLAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1 WORLD ONLINE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

INTELLECTSOFT GROUP CORPORATION

INTELLECTSOFT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KAHANA, AMIR M.

FIELDS, MARK C

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

12/27/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

12/30/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Case Management Statement of 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation Filed

10/30/2019: Case Management Statement of 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

10/30/2019: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of Intellectsoft LLC Filed

11/13/2019: Case Management Statement of Intellectsoft LLC Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/14/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/14/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/14/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/6/2019: Tentative Case Management Order

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

6/4/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Intellectsoft LLC

5/29/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Intellectsoft LLC

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/19/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Intellectsoft LLC Filed

4/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Intellectsoft LLC Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 6

4/3/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 08/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 6

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/3/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation

3/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

3/29/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/29/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: C. Don Clay; Department: Dept 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/19/2020 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Intellectsoft LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: C. Don Clay; Department: Dept 6

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Intellectsoft LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Intellectsoft LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 1 World Online, Inc., a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELDS MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE