This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/01/2023 at 20:06:17 (UTC).

Vicki Jo Young, William Lawrence Curran Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Vicki Jo Young, William Lawrence Curran was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1046

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vikki Jo Young

Decedent

William Lawrence Curran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

D Huffaker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2023

DocketDescription: 431- Review For Compliance; Docket Date: 9/8/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 12/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 11/23/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 9/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 9/3/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 8/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 8/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: REN - Renunciation & Nomination; Docket Date: 8/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: IAR - Informal Appointment Of Personal Representative; Docket Date: 8/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 8/23/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 8/23/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 8/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

DocketDescription: APL - Application; Docket Date: 8/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 8/17/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 8/13/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 8/13/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 8/13/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less