This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 11:01:12 (UTC).

Tomi Fay Mangum Lindblom VS Banner Health Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Tomi Fay Mangum Lindblom filed an Other lawsuit against Banner Health. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hopkins, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0884

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hopkins, Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tomi Fay Mangum Lindblom

Defendants

Banner Health

Carlyn Brooke Coates

Banner Medical Group

Banner Urgent Care-Arizona L L C

Pierpoint Family Medicine L L C

Full Circle Health

Eric O Shreder

Carrie Sand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Riggs

Defendant Attorneys

Sigurds Krolls

Scott Holden

Michele Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference; Result: Vacated & Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/8/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:1/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:1/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:11/2/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Supplemental Joint Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:2/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less