This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 02:21:48 (UTC).

Samad Gooby VS Sharon Medina

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Samad Gooby filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sharon Medina. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Avelar, Stasy. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0452

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Avelar, Stasy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Samad Gooby

Respondent

Sharon Medina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/12/2022

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 12/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

DocketDescription: MOT - Motion; Docket Date: 12/15/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 12/13/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 11/28/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

DocketDescription: NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case; Docket Date: 10/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022

DocketDescription: ACS - Acceptance Of Service; Docket Date: 10/5/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketDescription: MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution; Docket Date: 9/21/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 7/20/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2022

DocketDescription: ACS - Acceptance Of Service; Docket Date: 7/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins; Docket Date: 6/14/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: PIN - Preliminary Injunction; Docket Date: 6/14/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 6/14/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 6/14/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 6/14/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less