This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 04:18:43 (UTC).

Rubby S Gyamfi VS Paa Kwesi Yanful

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Rubby S Gyamfi filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Paa Kwesi Yanful. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blanchard, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0391

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blanchard, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rubby S Gyamfi

Respondent

Paa Kwesi Yanful

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/14/2021

Docket042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:5/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021

DocketNOTE: Response to PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (DIVORCE) WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN/ PAID $274.00 RECEIPT #28222025

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021

DocketANS - Answer (docket date:4/19/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2021

DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:3/10/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:2/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:2/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less