This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2022 at 05:30:47 (UTC).

Romac Rick Rafei VS Safieh S Saberi

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Romac Rick Rafei filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Safieh S Saberi. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiefer, Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0549

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiefer, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Romac Rick Rafei

Respondent

Safieh S Saberi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/30/2021

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketNOTE: Decree of Dissolution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketDDI - Decree Of Dissolution (docket date:10/6/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:8/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:7/8/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less