This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2023 at 18:01:57 (UTC).

Roland Rose, Salina Hudson Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Roland Rose, Salina Hudson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Salina Hudson

Decedent

Roland Ross

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2023

DocketDescription: 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court; Docket Date: 2/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance); Result: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 2/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketDescription: 056 - ME: Hearing Set; Docket Date: 1/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 1/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 1/11/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 1/11/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less