This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 07:10:30 (UTC).

Pueblo Verde Community Association VS Gabriela Navarrete

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Pueblo Verde Community Association filed an Other lawsuit against Gabriela Navarrete. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3920

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pueblo Verde Community Association

Defendant

Gabriela Navarrete

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

B Baillio

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Pueblo Verde Community Association; Judgement Against: Gabriela Navarrete; Amount: $4,112.72; Frequency: One Time; Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Pueblo Verde Community Association; Judgement Against: Gabriela Navarrete; Amount: $12.80; Frequency: One Time; Type: Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Pueblo Verde Community Association; Judgement Against: Gabriela Navarrete; Amount: $1,245.00; Frequency: One Time; Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Pueblo Verde Community Association; Judgement Against: Gabriela Navarrete; Amount: $525.66; Frequency: One Time; Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: DFJ - Default Judgment; Docket Date: 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AAF - Application For Attorney Fees; Docket Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SOC - Statement Of Costs; Docket Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees; Docket Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 9/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To; Docket Date: 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less