This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 04:10:15 (UTC).

Priscilla Bush, Sidney Luckett Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Priscilla Bush, Sidney Luckett was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0361

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Priscilla Bush

Decedent

Sidney Luckett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/25/2022

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 3/31/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022

DocketDescription: SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 3/31/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 3/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 3/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: WOB - Waiver Of Bond; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: WAV - Waiver; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 3/25/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less