This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 13:01:09 (UTC).

Prestige Financial Services Inc VS Amorette M Duer Estrada Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Prestige Financial Services Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Amorette M Duer Estrada. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3482

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prestige Financial Services Inc

Defendants

Manuel Estrada

Amorette M Duer Estrada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Partridge

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/30/2022

Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Prestige Financial Services Inc; Judgement Against: Manuel Estrada Jr. Judgement Against: Amorette M Duer Estrada; Amount: $12,499.80; Frequency: One Time; Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Prestige Financial Services Inc; Judgement Against: Manuel Estrada Jr. Judgement Against: Amorette M Duer Estrada; Amount: $2,191.43; Frequency: One Time; Type: Interest

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Prestige Financial Services Inc; Judgement Against: Manuel Estrada Jr. Judgement Against: Amorette M Duer Estrada; Amount: $3,124.95; Frequency: One Time; Type: Attorney Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Prestige Financial Services Inc; Judgement Against: Manuel Estrada Jr. Judgement Against: Amorette M Duer Estrada; Amount: $434.69; Frequency: One Time; Type: Costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketDescription: STJ - Stipulated Judgment; Docket Date: 12/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022

DocketDescription: SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment; Docket Date: 12/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 11/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketDescription: CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less