Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 07:39:48 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C VS Amaranta A Campos

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Amaranta A Campos. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7596

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C

Defendant

Amaranta A Campos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arika Hover

Michael Chalhoub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Service/ amranta a campos and jane john doe campos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less