Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 08:06:09 (UTC).

Peter Joseph Vargas VS Roger Anthony Gomez

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Peter Joseph Vargas filed an Other lawsuit against Roger Anthony Gomez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7617

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Joseph Vargas

Defendant

Roger Anthony Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Brill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less