This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 12:06:24 (UTC).

Persolve Recoveries L L C VS Jermond Barnes

Case Summary

On 08/01/2021 Persolve Recoveries L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Jermond Barnes. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2774

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Persolve Recoveries L L C

Defendant

Jermond Barnes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Vaughan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2021

JudgementJudgment For: Persolve Recoveries L L C Judgment Against: Jermond Barnes, Amount: $8,687.38, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

JudgementJudgment For: Persolve Recoveries L L C Judgment Against: Jermond Barnes, Amount: $411.39, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

JudgementJudgment For: Persolve Recoveries L L C Judgment Against: Jermond Barnes, Amount: $2,606.21, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:12/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketNOTE: Declaration of Cost AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketDCL - Declaration (docket date:11/8/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry of Judgment Without Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:11/8/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021

DocketNOTE: Declaration of Sum CERTAIN JUDGMENT AMOUNT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
08/01/2021

DocketNOTE: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketNOTE: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:8/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:8/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketNOTE: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:8/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less