This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:10:55 (UTC).

Michael Greene Meiner VS U S S A Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Michael Greene Meiner filed an Other lawsuit against U S S A Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0368

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Greene Meiner

Defendant

U S S A Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael York

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2021

DocketNOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021

DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:4/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketNOTE: Notice of Completion and Perfection of Service of Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:2/8/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketNOTE: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:1/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:1/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less