This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 21:27:43 (UTC).

Madison Winiker VS Mark Winiker

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Madison Winiker filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Mark Winiker. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Avelar, Stasy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0111

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Avelar, Stasy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Madison Shea Norman

Respondent

Mark Winiker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/14/2021

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021

Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement Against:;; Frequency: One Time; Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021

DocketDescription: DFS - Default Decree; Docket Date: 7/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2021

DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 6/23/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case; Docket Date: 6/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021

DocketDescription: 019 - ME: Ruling; Docket Date: 5/3/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021

DocketDescription: MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution; Docket Date: 4/26/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2021

DocketDescription: AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default; Docket Date: 4/9/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2021

DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 2/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketDescription: NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins; Docket Date: 2/8/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketDescription: PIN - Preliminary Injunction; Docket Date: 2/8/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 2/8/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketDescription: SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 2/8/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 2/8/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less