This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 09:18:31 (UTC).

Kimberly Fay Strobel VS Wesley Ryan Strobel

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Kimberly Fay Strobel filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Wesley Ryan Strobel. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Crandell, Rusty and DRJUN, DRJUN. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3116

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Crandell, Rusty

DRJUN, DRJUN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kimberly Fay Strobel

Respondent

Wesley Ryan Strobel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/17/2021

Docket088 - ME: Case Transferred (docket date:12/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021

HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Trial/Evh Held-Petition Concluded

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2021

DocketNOTE: PreTrialStatement/ JOINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2021

DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:12/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketNOTE: RE / TEMPORARY ORDERS WITH NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:12/9/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE / NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketTOW Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice (docket date:12/2/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/17/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less