This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 06:06:37 (UTC).

Judy Casiano VS Robert Casiano

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Judy Casiano filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Robert Casiano. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wahlin, Lisa S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3528

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wahlin, Lisa S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Judy Casiano

Respondent

Robert Casiano

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2022

DocketDescription: OLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service; Docket Date: 12/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022

DocketDescription: OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel; Docket Date: 10/20/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketDescription: MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel; Docket Date: 10/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketDescription: NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service; Docket Date: 10/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: NTC - Notice to Creditors; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: PIN - Preliminary Injunction; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 8/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less