This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 06:01:00 (UTC).

James L Underhill, Tamara M Richards Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 James L Underhill, Tamara M Richards was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0711

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tamara M Richards

Decedent

James L Underhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rita Daninger

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2022

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 12/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketDescription: FAC - Final Accounting; Docket Date: 12/20/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketDescription: FAC - Final Accounting; Docket Date: 12/20/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account; Docket Date: 12/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketDescription: 022 - ME: Order Signed; Docket Date: 9/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 9/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022

DocketDescription: MOT - Motion; Docket Date: 9/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

DocketDescription: 022 - ME: Order Signed; Docket Date: 8/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022

HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance); Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 8/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
07/02/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 7/7/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 7/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 6/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 6/22/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: WIL - Will; Docket Date: 6/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 6/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 6/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 6/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 6/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 6/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less