This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 11:23:25 (UTC).

Homesite Insurance Company VS Brenner Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Homesite Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Brenner Construction Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1900

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Homesite Insurance Company

Defendants

Brenner Construction Inc

J L Baugh Home Improvement L L C

Joshua L Baugh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Gladner

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Sannes

Carson Emmons

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2022

DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance and Removal of Appearance Within Same Firm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketNSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (docket date:4/8/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:4/4/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022

DocketNOTE: EXTENDING THE ARBITRATION DEADLINE AND DISMISSAL DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022

DocketORD - Order (docket date:4/8/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketNOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JL BAUGH HOME IMPROVEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:3/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022

DocketNOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND ARBITRATION HEARING DEADLINE AND DISMISSAL DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022

Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/6/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
05/13/2021

DocketNOTE: BRENNER CONSTRUCTION INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketNOTE: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:4/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:4/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketNOTE: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:4/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less