This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 04:43:21 (UTC).

Gloria McCabe, Trinidad Marie Torres Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Gloria McCabe, Trinidad Marie Torres was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0363

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gloria McCabe

Decedent

Trinidad Marie Torres

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2021

DocketDescription: IAA INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL; Docket Date: 9/16/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketDescription: CST - Closing Statement; Docket Date: 9/16/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 9/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 9/15/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 4/28/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketDescription: DED - Deed Of Distribution; Docket Date: 4/29/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketDescription: WAV - Waiver; Docket Date: 4/29/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketDescription: WAV - Waiver; Docket Date: 4/29/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketDescription: WAV - Waiver; Docket Date: 4/29/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 4/13/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 4/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 4/2/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 4/2/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 4/2/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 4/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 4/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 4/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 3/31/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 3/31/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 3/31/2021; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less