This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/11/2022 at 09:11:59 (UTC).

Fred W Neff VS Katherine J Neff

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Fred W Neff filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Katherine J Neff. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Crandell, Rusty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2868

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Crandell, Rusty

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fred W Neff

Respondent

Katherine J Neff

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2021

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021

DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:11/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:10/8/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/21/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:8/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:8/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:8/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:8/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less