This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 05:04:17 (UTC).

Dominic Montelongo, Rachell Montelongo Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Dominic Montelongo, Rachell Montelongo was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0388

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Rachell Montelongo

Vincent Montelongo

Not Classified By Court

Dominic Montelongo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2022

DocketDescription: 019 - ME: Ruling; Docket Date: 7/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 7/22/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 6/17/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketDescription: 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev; Docket Date: 6/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Adult; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 6/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

DocketDescription: OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

DocketDescription: OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person; Docket Date: 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketDescription: IRE - Investigative Report; Docket Date: 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketDescription: CIR Court Investigator Reports - Confidential; Docket Date: 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 4/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 4/1/2022; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketDescription: OWV ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS; Docket Date: 4/1/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less