This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 08/27/2023 at 19:02:00 (UTC).

Conniemae J Bailey, Donna Marie Manobianco Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 Conniemae J Bailey, Donna Marie Manobianco was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1426

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donna Marie Manobianco

Decedent

Conniemae J Bailey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Charles Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/24/2023

DocketDescription: AFF - Affidavit; Docket Date: 1/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 1/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 12/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 12/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 12/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketDescription: SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 12/29/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 12/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: WIL - Will; Docket Date: 12/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less