This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 04:33:32 (UTC).

Christina Desiree Alvarado Et Al VS Ricardo Hernandez Hernandez

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Christina Desiree Alvarado filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Ricardo Hernandez Hernandez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaney, Scott. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0575

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blaney, Scott

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Witness(1) Dept Of Economic Security (DES)

Christina Desiree Alvarado

Respondents

Ricardo Hernandez Hernandez

Ricardo Hernandez Hernand

Minor

Party is a minor: name not publishedWitness

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kathryn Harris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2021

Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:9/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:9/1/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketNOTE: CORRECTING CLERICAL ERROR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketORD - Order (docket date:9/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:8/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketNOTE: MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:8/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Vacate (Lack of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

Docket078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:8/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2021

DocketNOTE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
04/19/2021

DocketAFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 (docket date:4/21/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021

Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:4/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:4/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/2/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021

DocketNOTE: Order To Appear Title IV-D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021

DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:3/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:3/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:3/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:3/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less