This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/23/2023 at 10:04:40 (UTC).

Karol A Baca, Myrll E Kirkland Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2023 Karol A Baca, Myrll E Kirkland was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1267

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Karol A Baca

Decedent

Myrll E Kirkland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Charles Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 10/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 10/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 10/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketDescription: SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 9/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 9/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 9/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: CAP - Consent To Appointment; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: CAP - Consent To Appointment; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: CAP - Consent To Appointment; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: CAP - Consent To Appointment; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: CAP - Consent To Appointment; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 9/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less