This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/03/2023 at 21:05:19 (UTC).

Jane E Andersen, Jon K Andersen Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 Jane E Andersen, Jon K Andersen was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Corral, Janette. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1243

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Corral, Janette

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jane E Andersen

Jon Keith Andersen

Not Classified By Court

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2023

DocketDescription: 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev; Docket Date: 11/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 12/2/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Adult; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketDescription: OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person; Docket Date: 11/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketDescription: OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 11/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 11/21/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 11/21/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 11/20/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 11/20/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketDescription: MDR Medical Report Confidential; Docket Date: 10/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 10/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Ward (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: PTT - Petition; Docket Date: 9/29/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less