This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 04:07:55 (UTC).

Cruz Reyna, Shane Alexander Smolak Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2023 Cruz Reyna, Shane Alexander Smolak was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0826

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shane Alexander Smolak

Decedent

Cruz Reyna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kirsten Copeland

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023

DocketDescription: CAE - Claims Against Estate; Docket Date: 11/6/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 10/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketDescription: IAA INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL; Docket Date: 10/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 7/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 7/9/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 6/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketDescription: SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate; Docket Date: 6/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketDescription: OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 6/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketDescription: PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE; Docket Date: 6/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: WIL - Will; Docket Date: 6/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 6/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 6/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 6/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less