This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 21:02:44 (UTC).

Emily Weber, Jeremy Weber Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 Emily Weber, Jeremy Weber was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bell, Christian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3637

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bell, Christian

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jeremy Weber

Emily Weber

Not Classified By Court

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cory Stuart

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Paul Theut

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2024

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Adult

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketDescription: OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor; Docket Date: 10/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketDescription: NAR - Notice Of Appearance; Docket Date: 10/9/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketDescription: 022 - ME: Order Signed; Docket Date: 10/5/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: OWV ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS; Docket Date: 10/3/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 10/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: MDR Medical Report Confidential; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less