This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 16:05:15 (UTC).

Carlie Mooney, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 Carlie Mooney, Party is a minor name not published was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1287

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carlie Mooney

Not Classified By Court

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2023

DocketDescription: 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev; Docket Date: 11/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Adult; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketDescription: OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 11/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketDescription: OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person; Docket Date: 11/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketDescription: IRE - Investigative Report; Docket Date: 11/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketDescription: DCL - Declaration; Docket Date: 11/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketDescription: APU - Affidavit Of Publication; Docket Date: 11/3/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketDescription: ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees; Docket Date: 10/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketDescription: ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver; Docket Date: 10/25/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketDescription: OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor; Docket Date: 10/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 10/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: MDR Medical Report Confidential; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 9/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less