This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/16/2023 at 09:05:39 (UTC).

Emem Nkana, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 Emem Nkana, Party is a minor name not published was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0446

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Emem Nkana

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2023

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 6/14/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev; Docket Date: 6/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Minor; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: OCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child; Docket Date: 6/9/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 6/9/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 6/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 6/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 4/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 4/5/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 4/5/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 4/5/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 4/5/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less