This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/02/2023 at 03:14:14 (UTC).

Carla Mathieu, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 Carla Mathieu, Party is a minor name not published was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rhoades, Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3642

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rhoades, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carla Mathieu

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Charles Dyer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2023

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Minor; Result: Vacated & Reset

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketDescription: 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev; Docket Date: 11/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketDescription: LTA - Letter Of Appointment; Docket Date: 11/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketDescription: OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement; Docket Date: 11/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 11/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketDescription: OCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child; Docket Date: 11/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Minor; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 10/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketDescription: DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion; Docket Date: 10/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 10/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
10/09/2023

DocketDescription: ORD - Order; Docket Date: 10/9/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketDescription: ACS - Acceptance Of Service; Docket Date: 10/6/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketDescription: MOT - Motion; Docket Date: 10/6/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketDescription: MOT - Motion; Docket Date: 10/6/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 10/5/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: CSH - Coversheet; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketDescription: APE - Application/Petition; Docket Date: 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less