This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 13:28:32 (UTC).

Brittany Jones

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Brittany Jones was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kaiser, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3385

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kaiser, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittany Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2022

Docket375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:3/7/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022

HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated & Reset

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated & Reset

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021

HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated & Reset

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2021) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/23/2021) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less