This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/01/2023 at 13:21:28 (UTC).

Brennen Madyson Collins, Timothy Andrew Trank Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 Brennen Madyson Collins, Timothy Andrew Trank was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Selzer, Sarah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0104

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Selzer, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Timothy Andrew Trank

Guardian Ad Litem

Brennen Madyson Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/29/2023

DocketDescription: 433 - Decree Of Adoption; Docket Date: 3/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance); Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: CER - Certificate; Docket Date: 3/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: DEA - Decree of Adoption; Docket Date: 3/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketDescription: PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing; Docket Date: 3/21/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketDescription: NOH - Notice Of Hearing; Docket Date: 2/8/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDescription: PFA - Approval Of Adoption Agreement; Docket Date: 1/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDescription: CTA - Consent To Adopt; Docket Date: 1/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDescription: PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 1/30/2023; Filing Party: Petitioner (2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less