This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 08/26/2022 at 19:16:32 (UTC).

Brendan Stinnett VS Aerika Stinnett

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Brendan Stinnett filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Aerika Stinnett. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Marvin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2619

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Davis, Marvin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brendan Stinnett

Respondent

Aerika Stinnett

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/19/2022

DocketNOTE: TEMPORARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketORD - Order (docket date:8/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:8/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Trial/Evh Held-Petition Concluded

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022

Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:7/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022

DocketNOTE: RE: TEMPORARY ORDERS WITH NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022

DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:6/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:6/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/15/2022

DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:6/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE FOR LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketTOW Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice (docket date:6/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less