This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:30:01 (UTC).

Bradley A Hunter VS Christi A Hunter

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Bradley A Hunter filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Christi A Hunter. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Lori and Click, Stasy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0106

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Lori

Click, Stasy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bradley A Hunter

Respondent

Christi A Hunter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2022

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:6/1/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:5/20/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:4/6/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:2/28/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:2/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/16/2022) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less