This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 19:43:56 (UTC).

Bonnie Pflumm VS Dan R Pflumm

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Bonnie Pflumm filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Dan R Pflumm. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Cushner, Quintin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1462

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Cushner, Quintin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bonnie Pflumm

Respondent

Dan R Pflumm

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2022

DocketDescription: RNM - Returned Mail; Docket Date: 12/5/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketDescription: OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution; Docket Date: 11/3/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketDescription: RNM - Returned Mail; Docket Date: 9/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

DocketDescription: NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case; Docket Date: 8/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022

DocketDescription: MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel; Docket Date: 8/3/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022

DocketDescription: OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel; Docket Date: 8/5/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2022

DocketDescription: MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel; Docket Date: 8/3/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketDescription: AFS - Affidavit Of Service; Docket Date: 5/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: NOT - Notice; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: NAR - Notice Of Appearance; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: PIN - Preliminary Injunction; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: SUM - Summons; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: COM - Complaint; Docket Date: 5/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less