This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/26/2022 at 05:48:13 (UTC).

Anthony J Cywinski, Joseph J Cywinski Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Anthony J Cywinski, Joseph J Cywinski was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Williams, Paula and Corral, Janette. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0705

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Williams, Paula

Corral, Janette

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Joseph J Cywinski

Anthony J Cywinski

Decedent

Susan Anastasia Hubbard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/04/2021

DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:6/9/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021

DocketNOTE: AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021

DocketATP - Affidavit Of Transfer Of Title To Real Property (docket date:6/9/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021

DocketNOTE: DENIED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021

DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:6/9/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:6/2/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021

DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:6/2/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less