Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 05:07:37 (UTC).

Andrea Barbara Peet VS Robert Lee Beaty

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Andrea Barbara Peet filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Robert Lee Beaty. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0693

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andrea Barbara Peet

Respondent

Robert Lee Beaty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:4/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:3/10/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:3/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less