Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 07:58:06 (UTC).

Alberto Angulo VS Brian Flores Barrera

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Alberto Angulo filed an Other lawsuit against Brian Flores Barrera. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7606

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alberto Angulo

Defendant

Brian Flores Barrera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Brill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTE: BRIAN FLORES BARRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less