Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 08:09:57 (UTC).

(1) City of Phoenix VS (4) Maricopa County Treasurers Office Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 1 City of Phoenix filed an Other lawsuit against 4 Maricopa County Treasurers Office. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7589

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

(1) City of Phoenix

Defendants

Jeremiah Holdings L L C

Dialysis Newco L L C

(4) Maricopa County Treasurers Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan Leavitt

Defendant Attorney

Davina Bressler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Emergency Hearing; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:6/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION TIER 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:6/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation for Immediate Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:6/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant Maricopa County's Waiver of Appearance at Hearings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketWAV - Waiver (docket date:5/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Agreement on Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:5/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:5/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:5/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less