Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 08:40:51 (UTC).

Wright Holdings L L C Et Al VS Sierra Verde Community Association

Case Summary

On 07/07/2014 Wright Holdings L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Sierra Verde Community Association. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3465

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wright Holdings L L C

Adelina Bovier

Darrel Davis

Kay Davis

Tanesha Griffin

Carrie Thomas

David Marcinek

Kim Marcinek

Wayne Russell

Linda Russell

Gary Schmertmann

Dorothy St Charles

Rebecca Welker

Carlos Trujillo

Crystal Trujillo

Defendant

Sierra Verde Community Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J Wood

Erin Iungerich

Defendant Attorney

Troy Stratman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2016
  • 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset (docket date:7/7/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:7/6/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont (docket date:7/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • SOF - Statement Of Facts (docket date:6/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT SIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • REL - Reply (docket date:6/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT SIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • ORD - Order (docket date:6/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • NOTE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting the Motion and extending the deadline to June 29, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:6/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2014
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • 339 - ME: 100 Day Notice (docket date:11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:8/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • NOTE: Answer TO COMPLAINT/ EFILE BILLING $237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • NOTE: SIERRA VERDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:7/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/8/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/8/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/8/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less