Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 10:13:20 (UTC).

Wojciech Michal Lebiedzinski VS Uzabela Anna Anderson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Wojciech Michal Lebiedzinski filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Uzabela Anna Anderson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1030

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wojciech Michal Lebiedzinski

Respondents

Uzabela Anna Anderson

Izabela Anna Anderson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:2/23/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/19/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/19/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:1/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less