This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 11:43:39 (UTC).

Witness(1) Dept Of Economic Security (DES) Et Al VS Matthew Noah Morrison

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Witness 1 Dept Of Economic Security DES filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Matthew Noah Morrison. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marwil, Suzanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6881

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marwil, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Witness(1) Dept Of Economic Security (DES)

Yeskaila Jo Cooper

Respondent

Matthew Noah Morrison

Minor

Party is a minor: name not publishedWitness

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Amelia Gardner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less