This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/15/2016 at 06:11:09 (UTC).

William R Coe, Jean Staver Coe Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2011 William R Coe, Jean Staver Coe was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LaBianca, Margaret. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0695

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LaBianca, Margaret

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem

William R Coe

Not Classified By Court

Jean Staver Coe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Bryan Eastin

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Christopher Theut

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/21/2013

022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:5/21/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2013

OCG ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING (docket date:5/24/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2013

NOTE: GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT AND DECREE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISTRIBTUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2013

435 - Court Accountant Report (docket date:4/5/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2013

RES - Response (docket date:4/9/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2013

NOTE: TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE CONSERVATORS SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

435 - Court Accountant Report (docket date:2/26/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2013

PTT - Petition (docket date:1/11/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2013

NOTE: FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP/CONSERVATORSHIP WAIVER/APPROVAL OF FINAL ACCOUNT DECREE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2012

022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:11/20/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
03/10/2011

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

PTT - Petition (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

NOTE: FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

PTT - Petition (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

NOTE: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY PHYSICIAN AND INVESTIGATOR FOR AN ADULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

NOTE: TEMPORARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:3/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less