This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 19:04:57 (UTC).

William Eugene Remmert VS Kathleen Nicole Braswell

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 William Eugene Remmert filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kathleen Nicole Braswell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Marvin. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6883

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Davis, Marvin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

William Eugene Remmert

Respondent

Kathleen Nicole Braswell

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Not Classified By Court

Barb Kiffmeyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Annette Cox Sandoval

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket230 ME: Appointment of Child Representative (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Respondent's Resolution Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less