This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 12:48:31 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank N A VS Mark Bradley

Case Summary

On 07/14/2008 Wells Fargo Bank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Mark Bradley. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2281

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rees, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Defendant

Mark Bradley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Groves

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2008

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:9/18/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2008

WRE - Writ Of Restitution (docket date:9/19/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2008

PRA - Praecipe (docket date:9/3/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2008

AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service (docket date:8/25/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2008

NOTE: MARK BRADLEY SERVED 7-18-2008/NAIL AND MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2008

JUD - Judgment (docket date:8/21/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2008

NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2008

COM - Complaint (docket date:7/16/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less