This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/07/2017 at 12:31:50 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank N A VS Emma J Ramsier Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 Wells Fargo Bank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Emma J Ramsier. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2436

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Defendants

Emma J Ramsier

Techni-Weld Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/11/2017

JUD - Judgment (docket date:1/11/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2017

NOTE: JUDGMENT [UPON SUMMARY JUDGMENT]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016

019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:11/18/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2016

NOT - Notice (docket date:11/16/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2016

NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2016

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:11/16/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2016

NOTE: Affidavit of Military Status

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2016

094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:10/27/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2016

REL - Reply (docket date:10/21/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2016

NOTE: Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
08/03/2016

MOT - Motion (docket date:8/4/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2016

NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant Emma J. Ramsier by Alternative Method

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2016

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/27/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2016

NOTE: TECHNI-WELD INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2016

SUM - Summons (docket date:7/25/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

COM - Complaint (docket date:6/8/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:6/8/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:6/8/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2016

Judgment For: Wells Fargo Bank N A Judgment Against: Techni-Weld Inc, Amount: $32,278.98, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2017

Judgment For: Wells Fargo Bank N A Judgment Against: Techni-Weld Inc Judgment Against: Emma J Ramsier, Amount: $32,278.98, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less