This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/26/2020 at 04:33:59 (UTC).

Warren Mollicone VS Jennifer Mollicone

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Warren Mollicone filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jennifer Mollicone. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bachus, Alison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3012

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bachus, Alison

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Warren Mollicone

Respondent

Jennifer Mollicone

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christina Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less