This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/15/2016 at 17:57:46 (UTC).

Walter Relf, Mattie McCauley Relf Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2002 Walter Relf, Mattie McCauley Relf was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2353

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Walter Relf

Decedent

Mattie McCauley Relf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Paul Harter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/26/2007

CST - Closing Statement (docket date:2/27/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2006

ORD - Order (docket date:12/1/2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2006

NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CLOSING STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2006

MOT - Motion (docket date:11/24/2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2006

NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CLOSING STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2006

431- Review For Compliance (docket date:9/13/2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2006

LOR - Location Reassignment (docket date:3/9/2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2002

406 - Hrg: Sale Of Real Property (docket date:9/20/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2002

ORD - Order (docket date:9/19/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2002

NOTE: APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY & CONFIRMATION OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
07/01/2002

NOTE: OF INTESTACY, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS & APPT OF PERSONAL REP WALTER RELF WITHOUT BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2002

LTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:7/2/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2002

NOTE: OF PERSONAL REP WALTER RELF WITH RESTRICTIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2002

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:6/28/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2002

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:6/12/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2002

NOTE: ON PETITION FOR ADJUDICATION OF INTESTACY, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2002

PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:6/12/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2002

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:5/23/2002) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2002

AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:5/23/2002) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2002

NOTE: WALTER RELF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less