This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/22/2013 at 05:37:01 (UTC).

Waliam Yousif VS Marie Catherine Morocco

Case Summary

On 02/13/2012 Waliam Yousif filed an Other lawsuit against Marie Catherine Morocco. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Willett, Eileen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0241

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Willett, Eileen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waliam Yousif

Defendant

Marie Catherine Morocco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ward Rasmussen

Defendant Attorney

Peter Borns

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2012

Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:9/28/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2012

DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:10/4/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2012

DocketNOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2012

DocketSFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/19/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2012

DocketNOTE: Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2012

Docket078 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar (docket date:9/7/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2012

DocketNOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:8/31/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2012

DocketNOTE: Notice of Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2012

Docket339 - ME: 100 Day Notice (docket date:8/8/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2012

Docket311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:7/18/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/24/2012

DocketNOTE: Request For Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2012

DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:4/24/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2012

DocketNOTE: Defendants Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2012

DocketANS - Answer (docket date:4/24/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2012

DocketNOTE: Answer/Efile billing $223.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:3/26/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/30/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketNOTE: CATHERINE MOROCCO 03/16/2012

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2012

DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/14/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2012

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/14/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less